Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Order Date | 1901 |
For | 40 Steam locomotives |
Class | J10 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
74 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 02/1901 | 16/02/1953 | ||
75 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 02/1901 | 14/12/1956 | ||
76 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 03/1901 | 08/1947 | ||
77 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 03/1901 | 03/1958 | ||
79 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 04/1901 | 01/1939 | ||
80 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 04/1901 | 07/12/1956 | ||
81 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 05/1901 | 26/09/1959 | ||
82 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 05/1901 | 11/10/1958 | ||
83 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 06/1901 | 24/11/1952 | ||
84 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 06/1901 | 04/1937 | ||
90 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 06/1901 | 22/12/1956 | ||
94 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 06/1901 | 06/12/1956 | ||
95 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 07/1901 | 24/11/1956 | ||
96 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 08/1901 | 12/05/1952 | ||
97 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 08/1901 | 03/10/1959 | ||
98 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 08/1901 | 03/12/1956 | ||
99 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 10/08/1957 | ||
100 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 10/1901 | 28/02/1959 | ||
101 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 10/1901 | 25/08/1952 | ||
103 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 11/1901 | 22/09/1952 | ||
116 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 30/03/1953 | ||
117 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 11/01/1958 | ||
118 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 01/1902 | 14/05/1960 | ||
119 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 01/1902 | 04/08/1952 | ||
120 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 02/1902 | 12/12/1959 | ||
121 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 03/02/1948 | ||
122 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 02/1902 | 02/06/1958 | ||
123 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 08/1902 | 12/05/1956 | ||
124 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 26/08/1961 | ||
125 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 08/1902 | 13/12/1958 | ||
126 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 09/1902 | 26/04/1958 | ||
130 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 03/1902 | 30/03/1953 | ||
131 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 03/1902 | 22/03/1958 | ||
132 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 05/1902 | 17/12/1956 | ||
134 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 05/1902 | 17/11/1952 | ||
141 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 06/1902 | 07/07/1956 | ||
172 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 06/1902 | 28/11/1947 | ||
174 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 10/1902 | 04/11/1947 | ||
175 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 06/1902 | 12/1958 | ||
176 | J10 | MLSR | Parker | 0-6-0 | 07/1902 | 08/11/1958 |