Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Order Date | 1903 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | J11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
177 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 11/1903 | 21/10/1962 | ||
197 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1903 | 25/07/1962 | ||
202 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1903 | 15/08/1955 | ||
204 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 01/1904 | 09/04/1960 | ||
207 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 02/1904 | 24/10/1955 | ||
208 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 02/1904 | 15/04/1961 | ||
217 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1904 | 11/07/1955 | ||
220 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1904 | 25/03/1959 | ||
232 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 23/09/1962 | ||
233 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 05/1904 | 11/02/1961 | ||
240 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 07/1904 | 25/07/1961 | ||
241 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 07/1904 | 17/08/1959 |