Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO982
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1906
For 48 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
281 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1906 12/02/1960  
282 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1906 06/05/1960  
283 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 01/1907 05/11/1956  
284 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1907 28/10/1957  
285 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1907 10/11/1955  
286 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1907 14/10/1957  
287 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1907 25/07/1961  
288 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1907 11/07/1960  
289 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1907 06/02/1961  
290 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1907 23/04/1960  
291 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1907 23/09/1962  
292 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1907 11/12/1959  
293 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1907 05/11/1956  
294 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1907 13/12/1958  
295 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1907 29/12/1956  
296 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1907 28/10/1957  
297 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1907 14/10/1957  
298 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1907 04/11/1955  
299 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1907 22/07/1957  
300 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1907 26/10/1955  
301 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1907 21/11/1958  
302 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1907 29/08/1961  
303 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1907 25/11/1961  
304 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1907 10/08/1962  
305 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1907 09/06/1962  
306 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1907 11/12/1959  
307 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1907 01/09/1958  
308 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1907 30/03/1962  
309 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1907 27/01/1958  
311 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1907 08/11/1960  
312 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1907 09/01/1956  
313 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1907 25/07/1961  
314 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1907 04/04/1959  
315 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1907 22/12/1959  
316 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1907 21/05/1959  
317 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1907 24/10/1956  
318 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1907 28/01/1957  
319 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 01/1908 17/02/1960  
320 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 01/1908 08/10/1960  
  J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 28/02/1908 05/08/1961  
  J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 28/02/1908 10/11/1955  
324 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1908 09/06/1962  
325 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1908 11/01/1960  
326 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1908 25/02/1961  
327 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1908 03/12/1960  
328 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1908 10/02/1961  
329 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1908 23/09/1962  
330 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1908 19/04/1962