Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Order Date | 1910 |
For | 9 Steam locomotives |
Class | J11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
947 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 01/1910 | 24/08/1962 | ||
948 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 02/1910 | 29/03/1961 | ||
949 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 02/1910 | 21/04/1961 | ||
950 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 07/02/1957 | ||
951 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 22/10/1956 | ||
952 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1910 | 06/04/1962 | ||
953 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1910 | 22/12/1959 | ||
954 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1910 | 31/05/1960 | ||
955 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 05/1910 | 07/10/1957 |