Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 1898 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1008 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 611 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 10/1898 | 11/1945 | |
34 | 612 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 10/1898 | 04/12/1948 | |
48 | 613 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 10/1898 | 07/1946 | |
90 | 614 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 10/1898 | 10/1938 | |
98 | 615 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 10/1898 | 01/1947 | |
120 | 616 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 10/1898 | 08/04/1950 | |
183 | 617 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 10/1898 | 01/1944 | |
191 | 618 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 11/1898 | 02/1939 | |
192 | 619 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 11/1898 | 12/04/1958 | |
267 | 620 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 11/1898 | 08/11/1947 | |
297 | 621 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 11/1898 | 01/1937 | |
316 | 622 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 11/1898 | 11/1958 | |
332 | 623 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 11/1898 | 19/06/1948 | |
346 | 624 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 12/1898 | 06/1939 | |
351 | 625 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 12/1898 | 02/1929 | |
353 | 626 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 12/1898 | 08/1936 | |
356 | 627 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 12/1898 | 21/08/1948 | |
371 | 628 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 12/1898 | 07/08/1948 | |
379 | 629 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 12/1898 | 08/1940 | |
380 | 630 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 12/1898 | 12/1945 |