Manufacturer: Kitson
Builder | Kitson |
Order Date | 01/1912 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | O4 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1183 | 4891 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 10/09/1941 | |
1184 | 4892 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 09/09/1959 | |
1185 | 4893 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 14/09/1941 | |
1186 | 4894 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 07/03/1965 | |
1187 | 4895 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 12/12/1963 | |
1188 | 4896 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 09/12/1962 | |
1189 | 4897 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 14/02/1965 | |
1190 | 4898 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1912 | 19/11/1962 | |
1191 | 4899 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 09/12/1962 | |
1192 | 4900 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 20/12/1960 | |
1193 | 4901 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 11/07/1965 | |
1194 | 4902 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 13/07/1959 | |
1195 | 4903 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 17/11/1962 | |
1196 | 4904 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 12/09/1941 | |
1197 | 4905 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 04/10/1941 | |
1198 | 4906 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 01/08/1961 | |
1199 | 4907 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 24/09/1963 | |
1200 | 4908 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 09/11/1959 | |
1201 | 4909 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 01/02/1964 | |
1202 | 4910 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 19/09/1941 |