Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 234 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 234 Week
» 17570 Month
» 295366 Year
» 1179747 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Kitson



Order Details for Lot No: KI/415X
Builder Kitson
Order Date 01/1912
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class O4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1183 4891 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 10/09/1941  
1184 4892 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 09/09/1959  
1185 4893 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 14/09/1941  
1186 4894 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 07/03/1965  
1187 4895 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 12/12/1963  
1188 4896 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 09/12/1962  
1189 4897 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 14/02/1965  
1190 4898 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 19/11/1962  
1191 4899 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1912 09/12/1962  
1192 4900 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1912 20/12/1960  
1193 4901 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1912 11/07/1965  
1194 4902 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1912 13/07/1959  
1195 4903 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1912 17/11/1962  
1196 4904 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1912 12/09/1941  
1197 4905 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1912 04/10/1941  
1198 4906 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1912 01/08/1961  
1199 4907 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1912 24/09/1963  
1200 4908 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1912 09/11/1959  
1201 4909 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1912 01/02/1964  
1202 4910 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1912 19/09/1941