Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Kitson



Order Details for Lot No: KI/477Z
Builder Kitson
Order Date 1918
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1601 5183 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 25/10/1941  
1602 5184 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1603 5185 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 15/01/1966  
1604 5186 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 14/04/1964  
1605 5187 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 11/07/1965  
1606 5188 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 06/05/1964  
1607 5189 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 26/01/1962  
1608 5190 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 24/03/1961  
1609 5191 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 27/06/1965  
1610 5192 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 11/07/1965  
1611 5193 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 11/11/1963  
1612 5194 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 17/04/1966