Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 658 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4789 Week
» 14959 Month
» 292755 Year
» 1177136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Kitson



Order Details for Lot No: KI/479C
Builder Kitson
Order Date 1918
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1613 5199 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918  
1614 5200 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 19/09/1941  
1615 5201 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918  
1616 5202 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 29/12/1962  
1617 5203 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 19/11/1962  
1618 5204 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 23/09/1962  
1619 5205 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 13/09/1941  
1620 5206 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 09/12/1962  
1621 5207 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 05/10/1941  
1622 5208 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 08/08/1965  
1623 5209 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918  
1624 5210 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 18/05/1961  
1625 5211 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 01/11/1964  
1626 5212 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 19/09/1941  
1627 5213 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1918 17/12/1963  
1628 5214 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1918 15/12/1962  
1629 5215 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1918 19/01/1959  
1630 5216 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918  
1631 5217 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 02/12/1958  
1632 5218 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 18/10/1941