Manufacturer: Kitson
Builder | Kitson |
Order Date | 1904 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | M1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 4246 | M1 | LDECR | Markham | 0-6-4T | 05/1904 | 04/03/1946 | |
30 | 4247 | M1 | LDECR | Markham | 0-6-4T | 06/1904 | 09/12/1939 | |
31 | 4248 | M1 | LDECR | Markham | 0-6-4T | 06/1904 | 10/08/1946 | |
32 | 4249 | M1 | LDECR | Markham | 0-6-4T | 06/1904 | 04/07/1947 | |
33 | 4250 | M1 | LDECR | Markham | 0-6-4T | 06/1904 | 22/02/1939 | |
34 | 4251 | M1 | LDECR | Markham | 0-6-4T | 06/1904 | 18/06/1946 |