Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 522 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 21211 Month
» 269504 Year
» 1153885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L130
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 1905
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class C4
Information Hyde Park Works

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1083 16933 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 10/1905 12/1947  
1084 16934 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 10/1905 22/11/1950  
1085 16935 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 10/1905 17/11/1950  
1086 16936 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 10/1905 12/02/1949  
1087 16937 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 10/1905 11/1944  
1088 16938 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 10/1905 07/08/1949  
1089 16939 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 11/1905 04/1947  
1090 16940 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 11/1905 11/1939  
1091 16941 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 11/1905 20/03/1948  
1092 16942 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 11/1905 08/06/1949  
1093 16943 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 11/1905 13/11/1948  
1094 16944 C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 11/1905 12/05/1949