Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 01/1910 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J35 |
Information | Hyde Park Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
374 | 19085 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 23/09/1960 | |
375 | 19086 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 25/10/1961 | |
376 | 19087 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 03/12/1959 | |
377 | 19088 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 11/01/1962 | |
378 | 19089 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 10/1946 | |
379 | 19090 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 02/10/1959 | |
380 | 19091 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 04/1910 | 29/11/1962 | |
381 | 19092 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 04/1910 | 12/10/1959 | |
207 | 19093 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 16/09/1960 | |
208 | 19094 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 03/1910 | 23/09/1959 |