Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L44
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 1952
For 6 Diesel locomotives
Class D2/1
Information Built in-house by NBL at Queen's Park Works - sold to BR.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
11702 27430 D2/1     0-4-0 21/08/1954 12/03/1967  
11703 27431 D2/1     0-4-0 29/08/1955 03/02/1968  
11704 27432 D2/1     0-4-0 19/09/1955 24/06/1967  
11705 27433 D2/1     0-4-0 29/09/1955 03/08/1967  
11706 27434 D2/1     0-4-0 29/12/1955 04/03/1967  
11707 27435 D2/1     0-4-0 02/02/1956 04/03/1967