Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 14/02/1917 |
For | 41 Steam locomotives |
Class | O4 |
Information | Queen's Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1805 | 21772 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1917 | 29/12/1962 | |
1806 | 21773 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1917 | 18/10/1941 | |
1807 | 21774 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1917 | 09/12/1962 | |
1809 | 21776 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1917 | 09/09/1941 | |
1811 | 21778 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 03/10/1965 | |
1812 | 21779 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 17/11/1962 | |
1815 | 21782 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 04/04/1965 | |
1816 | 21783 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 10/02/1963 | |
1817 | 21784 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 21/09/1941 | |
1819 | 21786 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 19/07/1963 | |
1820 | 21787 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 19/09/1941 | |
1821 | 21788 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1917 | 27/02/1964 | |
1824 | 21791 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1917 | 18/05/1961 | |
1827 | 21794 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1917 | 19/11/1962 | |
1829 | 21796 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1917 | 31/10/1959 | |
1831 | 21798 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1917 | 09/03/1964 | |
1833 | 21800 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1917 | 12/03/1959 | |
1834 | 21801 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1917 | 17/11/1962 | |
1836 | 21803 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1917 | 02/12/1959 | |
1839 | 21806 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1917 | 07/02/1964 | |
1840 | 21807 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1917 | 26/11/1962 | |
1841 | 21808 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 01/1918 | 18/06/1959 |