Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L689
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 14/02/1917
For 41 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Queen's Park Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1801 21768 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917  
1802 21769 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917  
1803 21770 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917  
1804 21771 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917  
1805 21772 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917 29/12/1962  
1806 21773 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917 18/10/1941  
1807 21774 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917 09/12/1962  
1808 21775 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917  
1809 21776 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917 09/09/1941  
1810 21777 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917  
1811 21778 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 03/10/1965  
1812 21779 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 17/11/1962  
1813 21780 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917  
1814 21781 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917  
1815 21782 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 04/04/1965  
1816 21783 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 10/02/1963  
1817 21784 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 21/09/1941  
1818 21785 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917  
1819 21786 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 19/07/1963  
1820 21787 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 19/09/1941  
1821 21788 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 27/02/1964  
1822 21789 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917  
1823 21790 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917  
1824 21791 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917 18/05/1961  
1825 21792 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917  
1826 21793 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917  
1827 21794 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917 19/11/1962  
1828 21795 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917  
1829 21796 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917 31/10/1959  
1830 21797 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917  
1831 21798 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917 09/03/1964  
1832 21799 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917  
1833 21800 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 12/03/1959  
1834 21801 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 17/11/1962  
1835 21802 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917  
1836 21803 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 02/12/1959  
1837 21804 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917  
1838 21805 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917  
1839 21806 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 07/02/1964  
1840 21807 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 26/11/1962  
1841 21808 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 18/06/1959