Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L692
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 06/06/1917
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Hyde Park Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1842 21819 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1843 21820 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1844 21821 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1845 21822 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 13/09/1941  
1846 21823 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1847 21824 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 24/05/1962  
1848 21825 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 23/09/1962  
1849 21826 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 26/11/1962  
1850 21827 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918  
1851 21828 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918  
1852 21829 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918  
1853 21830 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918  
1854 21831 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 20/09/1941  
1855 21832 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 11/10/1941  
1856 21833 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 08/02/1964  
1857 21834 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 27/02/1966  
1858 21835 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 11/10/1964  
1859 21836 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 26/08/1962  
1860 21837 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 03/11/1962  
1861 21838 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 11/07/1965  
1862 21839 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 06/03/1959  
1863 21840 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 19/12/1965  
1864 21841 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 25/11/1962  
1865 21842 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918  
1866 21843 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 19/09/1941  
1867 21844 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 20/09/1941  
1868 21845 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 10/03/1963  
1869 21846 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 24/03/1962  
1870 21847 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 29/12/1962  
1871 21848 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918  
1872 21849 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918  
1873 21850 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 19/09/1941  
1874 21851 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 14/09/1941  
1875 21852 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 13/04/1962  
1876 21853 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 07/07/1963  
1877 21854 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918  
1878 21855 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 17/04/1966  
1879 21856 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 25/05/1961  
1880 21857 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 09/12/1962  
1881 21858 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 29/08/1963  
1882 21859 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 27/03/1966  
1883 21860 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918  
1884 21861 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 27/09/1964  
1885 21862 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 08/06/1962  
1886 21863 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 02/01/1966  
1887 21864 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 13/09/1941  
1888 21865 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918  
1889 21866 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918  
1890 21867 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918  
1891 21868 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918