Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 05/1918 |
For | 34 Steam locomotives |
Class | J37 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
88 | 21925 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1918 | 17/12/1962 | |
89 | 21926 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1918 | 28/10/1963 | |
123 | 21927 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1918 | 03/09/1965 | |
139 | 21928 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1918 | 29/11/1963 | |
151 | 21929 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 07/1918 | 08/03/1961 | |
157 | 21930 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 07/1918 | 11/05/1964 | |
158 | 21931 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 07/1918 | 14/11/1963 | |
161 | 21932 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 07/1918 | 19/10/1964 | |
162 | 21933 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 07/1918 | 08/06/1964 | |
167 | 21934 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 07/1918 | 02/10/1961 | |
274 | 21935 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 08/1918 | 09/04/1962 | |
295 | 21936 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 08/1918 | 05/08/1963 | |
305 | 21937 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 08/1918 | 23/10/1965 | |
314 | 21938 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 08/1918 | 14/09/1964 | |
315 | 21939 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 08/1918 | 12/10/1964 | |
456 | 21940 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 08/1918 | 04/04/1967 | |
457 | 21941 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 09/1918 | 17/08/1966 | |
458 | 21942 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 09/1918 | 21/05/1962 | |
459 | 21943 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 09/1918 | 28/12/1963 | |
460 | 21944 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 09/1918 | 15/10/1965 | |
461 | 21945 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 10/1918 | 29/12/1962 | |
462 | 21946 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 10/1918 | 25/11/1963 | |
463 | 21947 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 10/1918 | 23/12/1963 | |
464 | 21948 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 10/1918 | 15/07/1959 | |
465 | 21949 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1918 | 30/12/1964 | |
466 | 21950 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1918 | 29/06/1964 | |
467 | 21951 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1918 | 08/06/1964 | |
468 | 21952 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1918 | 23/06/1966 | |
469 | 21953 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1918 | 31/05/1963 | |
476 | 21954 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1918 | 14/05/1962 | |
477 | 21955 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1919 | 12/10/1964 | |
478 | 21956 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1919 | 31/07/1965 | |
479 | 21957 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1919 | 29/11/1963 | |
480 | 21958 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1919 | 29/12/1962 |