Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1918 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | K2 |
Information | Queen's Park Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1670 | 21981 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1918 | 13/12/1960 | |
1671 | 21982 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1918 | 19/01/1961 | |
1672 | 21983 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1918 | 22/06/1959 | |
1673 | 21984 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1918 | 06/02/1961 | |
1674 | 21985 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1918 | 07/09/1961 | |
1675 | 21986 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1918 | 01/05/1958 | |
1676 | 21987 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 23/01/1961 | |
1677 | 21988 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 06/01/1961 | |
1678 | 21989 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 26/01/1959 | |
1679 | 21990 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 02/09/1960 |