Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L703
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 09/04/1918
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Hyde Park Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1942 22000 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918  
1943 22001 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 29/12/1962  
1944 22002 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918  
1945 22003 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918  
1946 22004 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918  
1947 22005 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918  
1948 22006 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 20/03/1964  
1949 22007 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 08/08/1962  
1950 22008 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918  
1951 22009 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918  
1952 22010 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 16/06/1963  
1953 22011 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 05/10/1941  
1954 22012 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 13/09/1941  
1955 22013 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918  
1956 22014 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 12/01/1964  
1957 22015 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1918 29/08/1965  
1958 22016 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1918  
1959 22017 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1918 12/03/1964  
1960 22018 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1918  
1961 22019 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919  
1962 22020 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919 20/09/1941  
1963 22021 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919 20/09/1941  
1964 22022 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919  
1965 22023 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919  
1966 22024 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919  
1967 22025 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919  
1968 22026 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919  
1969 22027 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 29/12/1962  
1970 22028 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919  
1971 22029 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 19/01/1962