Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L712
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 24/10/1918
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Hyde Park Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2034 22128 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2035 22129 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2036 22130 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2037 22131 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2038 22132 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2039 22133 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2040 22134 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2041 22135 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2042 22136 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919  
2043 22137 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 22/06/1961  
2044 22138 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 02/06/1964  
2046 22139 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 04/05/1959  
2047 22140 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 03/11/1962  
2048 22141 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 22/02/1952  
2051 22142 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2052 22143 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 20/06/1965  
2053 22144 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 16/04/1959  
2054 22145 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 30/01/1964  
2055 22146 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 26/11/1963  
2056 22147 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 17/11/1962  
2057 22148 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2058 22149 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2059 22150 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 31/03/1959  
2060 22151 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2061 22152 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2062 22153 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 26/11/1962  
2063 22154 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 08/08/1962  
2064 22155 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 17/04/1966  
2065 22156 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 18/10/1963  
2066 22157 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 05/10/1961  
2067 22158 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2068 22159 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 21/02/1965  
2069 22160 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2070 22161 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2071 22162 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2072 22163 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2073 22164 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 03/11/1962  
2074 22165 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 20/06/1965  
2075 22166 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 08/08/1962  
2076 22167 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 17/11/1962  
2077 22168 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2078 22169 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 13/09/1941  
2079 22170 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 17/11/1962  
2080 22171 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2081 22172 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 11/07/1965  
2082 22173 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 17/11/1962  
2083 22174 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919  
2084 22175 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919 26/01/1962  
2087 22177 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919 18/10/1941  
2086 22186 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919