Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 750 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1790 Week
» 11960 Month
» 289756 Year
» 1174137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L713
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 24/10/1918
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Queen's Park Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2088 22178 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2089 22179 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2090 22180 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2091 22181 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2092 22182 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2093 22183 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2094 22184 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 30/01/1964  
2095 22185 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 15/01/1966  
2096 22186 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 26/11/1962  
2097 22187 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2098 22188 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 18/10/1941  
2099 22189 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 10/03/1959  
2100 22190 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2101 22191 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 21/03/1965  
2102 22192 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2103 22193 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2104 22194 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 14/03/1965  
2105 22195 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2106 22196 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2107 22197 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2108 22198 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2109 22199 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2110 22200 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 11/07/1965  
2111 22201 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2112 22202 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 17/03/1963  
2113 22203 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2114 22204 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2115 22205 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2116 22206 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 09/12/1962  
2117 22207 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2118 22208 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
2119 22209 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2120 22210 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2121 22211 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 23/05/1965  
2122 22212 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2123 22213 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2124 22214 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2125 22215 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2126 22216 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 09/06/1964  
2127 22217 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2128 22218 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
2129 22219 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919  
2130 22220 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919  
2131 22221 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919  
2132 22222 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919 08/08/1962  
2133 22223 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919 27/10/1962  
2134 22224 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919 02/03/1963  
2135 22225 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919 01/04/1960  
2136 22226 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919 02/12/1959  
2137 22227 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919