Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1294 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5254 Week
» 34840 Month
» 408853 Year
» 1630418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L714
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 24/10/1918
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Atlas Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2138 22228 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2139 22229 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2140 22230 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2141 22231 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2142 22232 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2143 22233 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919  
2144 22234 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 17/03/1963  
2145 22235 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1919 13/09/1961  
2146 22236 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2147 22237 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 18/10/1941  
2148 22238 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 20/06/1965  
2149 22239 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 11/07/1960  
2150 22240 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 21/07/1962  
2151 22241 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2152 22242 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 13/09/1941  
2153 22243 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 22/05/1963  
2154 22244 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2155 22245 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2156 22246 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919  
2157 22247 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 02/05/1963  
2158 22248 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919  
2159 22249 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919  
2160 22250 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919 25/05/1963  
2161 22251 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919  
2162 22252 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919 23/09/1962  
2163 22253 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919  
2164 22254 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919  
2165 22255 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1919 17/11/1962  
2166 22256 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1919  
2167 22257 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1919