Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1928 |
For | 25 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Information | Hyde Park Works |
Administration | Swindon Works order #256 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5700 | 23818 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1929 | 19/03/1956 | |
5701 | 23819 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1929 | 11/01/1958 | |
5702 | 23820 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1929 | 19/05/1960 | |
5703 | 23821 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1929 | 09/02/1959 | |
5704 | 23822 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1929 | 23/05/1960 | |
5705 | 23823 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1929 | 24/08/1959 | |
5706 | 23824 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 21/09/1961 | |
5707 | 23825 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 10/03/1959 | |
5708 | 23826 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 07/04/1959 | |
5709 | 23827 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 28/03/1960 | |
5710 | 23828 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 12/08/1957 | |
5711 | 23829 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 06/01/1958 | |
5712 | 23830 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 21/10/1957 | |
5713 | 23831 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1929 | 04/01/1960 | |
5714 | 23832 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 11/01/1958 | |
5715 | 23833 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 13/08/1958 | |
5716 | 23834 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 12/03/1958 | |
5717 | 23835 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 02/05/1960 | |
5718 | 23836 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 21/07/1958 | |
5719 | 23837 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 11/1958 | |
5720 | 23838 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 08/01/1962 | |
5721 | 23839 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 10/08/1959 | |
5722 | 23840 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 22/09/1958 | |
5723 | 23841 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 07/11/1957 | |
5724 | 23842 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1929 | 14/08/1957 |