Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 740 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 9079 Week
» 6187 Month
» 113133 Year
» 1334698 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L94
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 01/05/1957
For 48 Diesel locomotives
Class 21
Information Hyde Park Works - originally, this order was for 28 locomotives with a further 20 being added to the order.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
D6110 27840 21     Bo-Bo 20/05/1959 14/04/1968  
D6111 27841 21     Bo-Bo 12/05/1959 16/08/1968  
D6112 27842 21     Bo-Bo 20/05/1959 31/12/1971  
D6113 27843 21     Bo-Bo 27/05/1959 06/10/1971  
D6114 27844 21     Bo-Bo 27/05/1959 05/10/1971  
D6115 27845 21     Bo-Bo 02/06/1959 08/06/1968  
D6116 27846 21     Bo-Bo 09/06/1959 31/12/1971  
D6117 27847 21     Bo-Bo 16/06/1959 16/08/1968  
D6118 27848 21     Bo-Bo 24/06/1959 30/12/1967  
D6119 27849 21     Bo-Bo 30/06/1959 31/12/1971  
D6120 27850 21     Bo-Bo 07/07/1959 30/12/1967  
D6121 27851 21     Bo-Bo 18/08/1959 06/10/1971  
D6122 27852 21     Bo-Bo 15/09/1959 30/12/1967  
D6123 27853 21     Bo-Bo 22/09/1959 21/09/1971  
D6124 27854 21     Bo-Bo 29/09/1959 06/10/1971  
D6125 27855 21     Bo-Bo 29/09/1959 30/12/1967  
D6126 27856 21     Bo-Bo 06/10/1959 06/04/1968  
D6127 27857 21     Bo-Bo 06/10/1959 30/12/1967  
D6128 27858 21     Bo-Bo 13/10/1959 30/12/1967  
D6129 27859 21     Bo-Bo 27/10/1959 06/10/1971  
D6130 27860 21     Bo-Bo 27/10/1959 05/10/1971  
D6131 27861 21     Bo-Bo 03/11/1959 30/12/1967  
D6132 27862 21     Bo-Bo 17/11/1959 06/10/1971  
D6133 27863 21     Bo-Bo 24/11/1959 31/12/1971  
D6134 27864 21     Bo-Bo 01/12/1959 30/12/1967  
D6135 27865 21     Bo-Bo 08/12/1959 30/12/1967  
D6136 27866 21     Bo-Bo 17/12/1959 30/12/1967  
D6137 27867 21     Bo-Bo 22/12/1959 24/04/1971  
D6138 27942 21     Bo-Bo 02/02/1960 30/12/1967  
D6139 27943 21     Bo-Bo 16/02/1960 30/12/1967  
D6140 27944 21     Bo-Bo 24/02/1960 30/12/1967  
D6141 27945 21     Bo-Bo 15/03/1960 30/12/1967  
D6142 27946 21     Bo-Bo 22/03/1960 30/12/1967  
D6143 27947 21     Bo-Bo 30/03/1960 30/12/1967  
D6144 27948 21     Bo-Bo 05/04/1960 30/12/1967  
D6145 27949 21     Bo-Bo 15/04/1960 30/12/1967  
D6146 27950 21     Bo-Bo 29/04/1960 30/12/1967  
D6147 27951 21     Bo-Bo 05/05/1960 30/12/1967  
D6148 27952 21     Bo-Bo 15/05/1960 30/12/1967  
D6149 27953 21     Bo-Bo 30/05/1960 30/12/1967  
D6150 27954 21     Bo-Bo 06/06/1960 30/12/1967  
D6151 27955 21     Bo-Bo 13/06/1960 30/12/1967  
D6152 27956 21     Bo-Bo 24/06/1960 16/08/1968  
D6153 27957 21     Bo-Bo 06/07/1960 30/12/1967  
D6154 27958 21     Bo-Bo 14/07/1960 30/12/1967  
D6155 27959 21     Bo-Bo 16/08/1960 30/12/1967  
D6156 27960 21     Bo-Bo 15/09/1960 30/12/1967  
D6157 27961 21     Bo-Bo 07/12/1960 30/12/1967