Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 08/1945 |
For | 100 Steam locomotives |
Class | B1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1040 | 25796 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/04/1946 | 10/07/1966 | |
1041 | 25797 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/04/1946 | 19/04/1964 | |
1046 | 25798 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 29/05/1946 | 24/04/1962 | |
1042 | 25799 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/05/1946 | 17/04/1966 | |
1043 | 25800 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/05/1946 | 09/07/1962 | |
1044 | 25801 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 20/05/1946 | 17/03/1964 | |
1045 | 25802 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/05/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1047 | 25803 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 03/06/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1048 | 25804 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/06/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1049 | 25805 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/06/1946 | 07/11/1965 | |
1050 | 25806 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 17/06/1946 | 10/02/1966 | |
1051 | 25807 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 20/06/1946 | 10/02/1966 | |
1052 | 25808 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/06/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1053 | 25809 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 27/06/1946 | 25/02/1963 | |
1054 | 25810 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/07/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1055 | 25811 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/07/1946 | 27/02/1966 | |
1056 | 25812 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/07/1946 | 19/04/1964 | |
1057 | 25813 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 08/07/1946 | 17/04/1950 | |
1058 | 25814 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 10/07/1946 | 10/02/1966 | |
1059 | 25815 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 27/07/1946 | 25/11/1963 | |
1060 | 25816 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 01/08/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1061 | 25817 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 03/08/1946 | 13/09/1965 | |
1062 | 25818 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/08/1946 | 03/08/1964 | |
1063 | 25819 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 10/08/1946 | 26/03/1962 | |
1064 | 25820 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/08/1946 | 15/10/1962 | |
1065 | 25821 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 15/08/1946 | 01/09/1964 | |
1066 | 25822 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 19/08/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1067 | 25823 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/08/1946 | 29/12/1962 | |
1068 | 25824 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/08/1946 | 17/06/1963 | |
1069 | 25825 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/08/1946 | 26/08/1963 | |
1070 | 25826 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/08/1946 | 22/08/1965 | |
1071 | 25827 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 29/08/1946 | 11/02/1963 | |
1072 | 25828 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/09/1946 | 01/05/1967 | |
1073 | 25829 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/09/1946 | 22/09/1963 | |
1074 | 25830 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/09/1946 | 04/09/1963 | |
1075 | 25831 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/09/1946 | 22/09/1963 | |
1076 | 25832 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 17/09/1946 | 10/09/1965 | |
1077 | 25833 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/09/1946 | 14/05/1962 | |
1078 | 25834 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/09/1946 | 08/10/1962 | |
1079 | 25835 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/09/1946 | 18/06/1962 | |
1080 | 25836 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/09/1946 | 30/03/1964 | |
1081 | 25837 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 03/10/1946 | 29/06/1964 | |
1083 | 25838 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/10/1946 | 22/09/1963 | |
1082 | 25839 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/10/1946 | 29/12/1962 | |
1086 | 25840 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/10/1946 | 03/12/1962 | |
1084 | 25841 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/10/1946 | 29/06/1964 | |
1085 | 25842 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/10/1946 | 27/11/1961 | |
1087 | 25843 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/10/1946 | 05/12/1965 | |
1088 | 25844 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/10/1946 | 22/09/1963 | |
1089 | 25845 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/10/1946 | 02/04/1966 | |
1090 | 25846 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/10/1946 | 22/09/1963 | |
1091 | 25847 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/10/1946 | 10/09/1962 | |
1092 | 25848 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/10/1946 | 19/02/1966 | |
1093 | 25849 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/11/1946 | 25/07/1965 | |
1094 | 25850 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/11/1946 | 20/06/1965 | |
1095 | 25851 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/11/1946 | 28/12/1963 | |
1096 | 25852 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/11/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1097 | 25853 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 15/11/1946 | 03/01/1965 | |
1098 | 25854 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 19/11/1946 | 11/07/1965 | |
1099 | 25855 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 21/11/1946 | 02/09/1966 | |
1100 | 25856 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/11/1946 | 19/11/1962 | |
1101 | 25857 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/11/1946 | 31/12/1966 | |
1105 | 25858 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/12/1946 | 26/12/1964 | |
1106 | 25859 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/12/1946 | 02/11/1962 | |
1108 | 25860 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/12/1946 | 29/12/1962 | |
1107 | 25861 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 13/12/1946 | 15/08/1965 | |
1102 | 25862 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/12/1946 | 22/04/1967 | |
1103 | 25863 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/12/1946 | 14/07/1966 | |
1104 | 25864 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/12/1946 | 18/04/1964 | |
1109 | 25865 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/12/1946 | 12/07/1964 | |
1110 | 25866 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 20/12/1946 | 31/10/1965 | |
1111 | 25867 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/12/1946 | 16/09/1962 | |
1112 | 25868 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 27/12/1946 | 29/12/1962 | |
1113 | 25869 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 31/12/1946 | 22/09/1963 | |
1114 | 25870 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 08/01/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1115 | 25871 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 10/01/1947 | 08/05/1967 | |
1116 | 25872 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 13/01/1947 | 17/07/1966 | |
1117 | 25873 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 15/01/1947 | 06/02/1964 | |
1118 | 25874 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 17/01/1947 | 23/07/1964 | |
1119 | 25875 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 20/01/1947 | 25/11/1963 | |
1120 | 25876 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/01/1947 | 31/01/1965 | |
1121 | 25877 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/01/1947 | 17/04/1966 | |
1122 | 25878 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/01/1947 | 25/11/1963 | |
1123 | 25879 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/01/1947 | 11/05/1967 | |
1124 | 25880 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/02/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1125 | 25881 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/02/1947 | 28/12/1963 | |
1126 | 25882 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/02/1947 | 22/09/1963 | |
1127 | 25883 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/02/1947 | 15/08/1965 | |
1128 | 25884 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/02/1947 | 29/12/1962 | |
1129 | 25885 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/02/1947 | 13/09/1965 | |
1130 | 25886 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/02/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1131 | 25887 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 25/02/1947 | 06/12/1966 | |
1132 | 25888 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/02/1947 | 02/09/1966 | |
1133 | 25889 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1947 | 02/09/1966 | |
1134 | 25890 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/03/1947 | 05/10/1965 | |
1135 | 25891 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 10/03/1947 | 22/09/1963 | |
1136 | 25892 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/03/1947 | 22/10/1962 | |
1138 | 25894 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1947 | 03/01/1965 | |
1139 | 25895 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 01/04/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1137 | 25898 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 19/03/1947 | 28/05/1962 |