Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 118 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 24388 Month
» 24388 Year
» 1245953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L963
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 01/1946
For 150 Steam locomotives
Class B1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1190 26091 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/05/1947 20/06/1965  
1191 26092 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 13/05/1947 21/08/1965  
1192 26093 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/05/1947 08/10/1962  
1193 26094 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/05/1947 16/09/1962  
1194 26095 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/05/1947 29/08/1965  
1195 26096 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/05/1947 14/11/1965  
1196 26097 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/05/1947 26/09/1965  
1197 26098 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/05/1947 08/06/1964  
1198 26099 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/06/1947 05/04/1965  
1199 26100 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/06/1947 05/01/1967  
1200 26101 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/06/1947 29/12/1962  
1201 26102 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/06/1947 01/01/1962  
1202 26103 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/06/1947 16/09/1962  
1203 26104 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 17/06/1947 23/07/1962  
1204 26105 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/06/1947 25/11/1963  
1205 26106 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/06/1947 25/11/1963  
1206 26107 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 03/07/1947 03/09/1962  
1207 26108 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/06/1947 28/12/1963  
1208 26109 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/07/1947 26/09/1965  
1209 26110 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 01/07/1947 16/09/1962  
1210 26111 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 03/07/1947 10/02/1966  
1211 26112 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/07/1947 05/11/1962  
1212 26113 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/07/1947 01/11/1964  
1213 26114 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/07/1947 19/04/1964  
1214 26115 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/07/1947 03/05/1965  
1215 26116 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/07/1947 08/03/1965  
1216 26117 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/07/1947 23/01/1967  
1217 26118 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/08/1947 21/03/1962  
1218 26119 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 01/08/1947 03/07/1965  
1219 26120 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/08/1947 08/06/1964  
1220 26121 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/08/1947 04/10/1965  
1221 26122 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/08/1947 27/03/1965  
1222 26123 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/08/1947 18/01/1962  
1223 26124 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/08/1947 02/01/1966  
1224 26125 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/08/1947 31/07/1966  
1225 26126 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/08/1947 20/06/1965  
1226 26127 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/08/1947 16/09/1962  
1227 26128 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/08/1947 22/09/1963  
1228 26129 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/08/1947 16/09/1962  
1229 26130 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/09/1947 29/06/1964  
1230 26131 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/09/1947 19/11/1962  
1231 26132 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/09/1947 30/07/1962  
1232 26133 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/09/1947 19/02/1966  
1233 26134 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/09/1947 25/11/1963  
1234 26135 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/09/1947 13/08/1962  
1235 26136 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/09/1947 16/09/1962  
1236 26137 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 26/09/1947 16/09/1962  
1237 26138 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/09/1947 06/12/1966  
1238 26139 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 26/09/1947 17/02/1967  
1239 26140 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/10/1947 27/08/1962  
1240 26141 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/10/1947 06/12/1966  
1241 26142 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/10/1947 02/12/1962  
1242 26143 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/10/1947 23/07/1964  
1243 26144 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/10/1947 04/05/1964  
1244 26145 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 20/10/1947 29/10/1965  
1245 26146 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 20/10/1947 05/07/1965  
1246 26147 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/10/1947 29/12/1962  
1247 26148 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/10/1947 12/06/1962  
1248 26149 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/10/1947 07/11/1965  
1249 26150 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 31/10/1947 04/06/1964  
1250 26151 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 31/10/1947 17/04/1966  
1251 26152 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/11/1947 19/04/1964  
1252 26153 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/11/1947 25/11/1963  
1253 26154 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/11/1947 16/09/1962  
1254 26155 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/11/1947 16/09/1962  
1255 26156 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/11/1947 24/06/1967  
1256 26157 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 17/11/1947 07/11/1965  
1257 26158 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/11/1947 04/10/1965  
1258 26159 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/11/1947 05/01/1964  
1259 26160 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/11/1947 26/08/1965  
1260 26161 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 26/11/1947 29/12/1962  
1261 26162 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/11/1947 23/09/1966  
1262 26163 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 01/12/1947 22/04/1967  
1263 26164 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 03/12/1947 31/12/1966  
1264 26165 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 05/12/1947 21/11/1965  
1265 26166 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/12/1947 19/02/1962  
1266 26167 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/12/1947 16/09/1962  
1267 26168 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/12/1947 10/12/1962  
1268 26169 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/12/1947 28/12/1964  
1269 26170 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/12/1947 21/12/1963  
1270 26171 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/12/1947 22/09/1963  
1271 26172 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 26/12/1947 30/07/1962  
1272 26173 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/12/1947 03/01/1965  
1273 26174 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/12/1947 07/05/1963  
1274 26175 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/01/1948 23/11/1964  
1275 26176 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/01/1948 28/10/1965  
1276 26177 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/01/1948 28/06/1965  
1277 26178 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/01/1948 02/06/1964  
1278 26179 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/01/1948 22/04/1967  
1279 26180 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/01/1948 22/09/1963  
1280 26181 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 23/01/1948 16/09/1962  
1281 26182 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/01/1948 19/02/1966  
1282 26183 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/01/1948 16/09/1962  
1283 26184 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/02/1948 16/09/1962  
1284 26185 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/02/1948 16/09/1962  
1285 26186 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/02/1948 19/12/1965  
1286 26187 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/02/1948 16/09/1962  
1287 26188 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 13/02/1948 16/09/1962  
1288 26189 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/02/1948 06/01/1964  
1289 26190 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/02/1948 24/06/1967  
1290 26191 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 20/02/1948 21/03/1962  
1291 26192 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/02/1948 20/05/1965  
1292 26193 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/02/1948 10/09/1965  
1293 26194 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/02/1948 17/08/1966  
1294 26195 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 01/03/1948 13/11/1964  
1295 26196 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 03/03/1948 25/11/1962  
1296 26197 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/03/1948 19/11/1962  
1297 26198 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/03/1948 25/11/1962  
1298 26199 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/03/1948 14/06/1962  
1299 26200 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/03/1948 25/07/1965  
1300 26201 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/03/1948 25/11/1963  
1301 26202 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 17/03/1948 16/09/1962  
1302 26203 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/03/1948 02/04/1966  
1303 26204 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 26/03/1948 21/11/1966  
61304 26205 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 31/03/1948 31/10/1965  
61305 26206 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 01/04/1948 21/10/1963  
61306 26207 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 05/04/1948 30/09/1967  
61307 26208 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 07/04/1948 19/11/1966  
61308 26209 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/04/1948 19/11/1966  
61309 26210 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/04/1948 23/01/1967  
61310 26211 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/04/1948 05/04/1965  
61311 26212 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/04/1948 16/09/1962  
61312 26213 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 23/04/1948 01/03/1964  
61313 26214 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/04/1948 14/11/1965  
61314 26215 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/04/1948 28/12/1963  
61315 26216 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/04/1948 10/02/1966  
61316 26217 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/05/1948 29/12/1962  
61317 26218 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/05/1948 16/09/1962  
61318 26219 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/05/1948 22/09/1963  
61319 26220 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/05/1948 16/12/1966  
61320 26221 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/05/1948 19/08/1965  
61321 26222 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 20/05/1948 10/08/1964  
61322 26223 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/05/1948 20/02/1966  
61323 26224 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/05/1948 25/11/1963  
61324 26225 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 01/06/1948 12/10/1965  
61325 26226 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 03/06/1948 22/09/1963  
61326 26227 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/06/1948 20/03/1966  
61327 26228 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/06/1948 14/02/1965  
61328 26229 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/06/1948 22/09/1963  
61329 26230 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/06/1948 17/04/1966  
61330 26231 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 23/06/1948 19/11/1966  
61331 26232 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/06/1948 22/09/1963  
61332 26233 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/06/1948 29/12/1962  
61333 26234 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/07/1948 29/12/1962  
61334 26235 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 07/07/1948 01/12/1963  
61335 26236 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/07/1948 16/09/1962  
61336 26237 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 05/08/1948 22/09/1963  
61337 26238 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/08/1948 30/09/1967  
61338 26239 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 20/08/1948 11/01/1965  
61339 26240 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/09/1948 25/11/1962