Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 58 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7512 Week
» 10094 Month
» 274727 Year
» 1496292 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L97
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 05/11/1957
For 52 Diesel locomotives
Class 22
Information Queens Park
Administration Swindon Works order #440

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
D6306 27879 22 BR   B-B 12/10/1959 21/12/1968  
D6307 27880 22 BR   B-B 12/10/1959 27/03/1971  
D6308 27881 22 BR   B-B 07/01/1960 11/09/1971  
D6309 27882 22 BR   B-B 12/01/1960 22/05/1971  
D6310 27883 22 BR   B-B 05/01/1960 27/03/1971  
D6311 27884 22 BR   B-B 07/01/1960 23/09/1968  
D6312 27885 22 BR   B-B 14/01/1960 22/05/1971  
D6313 27886 22 BR   B-B 12/01/1960 03/08/1968  
D6314 27887 22 BR   B-B 25/01/1960 03/05/1969  
D6315 27888 22 BR   B-B 25/01/1960 22/05/1971  
D6316 27889 22 BR   B-B 01/03/1960 31/03/1968  
D6317 27890 22 BR   B-B 01/03/1960 23/09/1968  
D6318 27891 22 BR   B-B 14/03/1960 22/05/1971  
D6319 27892 22 BR   B-B 11/04/1960 11/09/1971  
D6320 27893 22 BR   B-B 23/03/1960 22/05/1971  
D6321 27894 22 BR   B-B 07/04/1960 03/08/1968  
D6322 27895 22 BR   B-B 07/04/1960 03/10/1971  
D6323 27896 22 BR   B-B 25/04/1960 22/05/1971  
D6324 27897 22 BR   B-B 01/06/1960 14/09/1968  
D6325 27898 22 BR   B-B 14/06/1960 05/10/1968  
D6326 27899 22 BR   B-B 16/05/1960 03/10/1971  
D6327 27900 22 BR   B-B 30/06/1960 22/05/1971  
D6328 27901 22 BR   B-B 18/06/1960 17/07/1971  
D6329 27902 22 BR   B-B 18/06/1960 30/11/1968  
D6330 27903 22 BR   B-B 26/07/1960 23/09/1971  
D6331 27904 22 BR   B-B 26/07/1960 27/03/1971  
D6332 27905 22 BR   B-B 28/07/1960 22/05/1971  
D6333 27906 22 BR   B-B 03/08/1960 01/01/1972  
D6334 27907 22 BR   B-B 01/12/1960 03/10/1971  
D6335 27908 22 BR   B-B 22/02/1961 14/09/1968  
D6336 27909 22 BR   B-B 03/07/1961 01/01/1972  
D6337 27910 22 BR   B-B 13/03/1962 21/10/1971  
D6338 27911 22 BR   B-B 29/03/1962 01/01/1972  
D6339 27912 22 BR   B-B 02/04/1962 01/01/1972  
D6340 27913 22 BR   B-B 03/04/1962 22/05/1971  
D6341 27914 22 BR   B-B 12/05/1962 30/11/1968  
D6342 27915 22 BR   B-B 11/05/1962 21/12/1968  
D6343 27916 22 BR   B-B 10/05/1962 03/10/1971  
D6344 27917 22 BR   B-B 18/05/1962 14/09/1968  
D6345 27918 22 BR   B-B 19/05/1962 14/09/1968  
D6346 27919 22 BR   B-B 08/06/1962 03/05/1969  
D6347 27920 22 BR   B-B 02/06/1962 31/03/1968  
D6348 27921 22 BR   B-B 14/06/1962 24/07/1971  
D6349 27922 22 BR   B-B 14/06/1962 14/09/1968  
D6350 27923 22 BR   B-B 27/06/1962 14/09/1968  
D6351 27924 22 BR   B-B 27/06/1962 30/11/1969  
D6352 27925 22 BR   B-B 12/07/1962 02/05/1971  
D6353 27926 22 BR   B-B 12/07/1962 23/09/1968  
D6354 27927 22 BR   B-B 02/08/1962 22/05/1971  
D6355 27928 22 BR   B-B 24/08/1962 14/09/1968  
D6356 27929 22 BR   B-B 27/09/1962 03/10/1971  
D6357 27930 22 BR   B-B 13/11/1962 21/12/1968