Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 07/1947 |
For | 70 Steam locomotives |
Class | K1 |
Information | Queen's Park Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
62001 | 26605 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 30/05/1949 | 25/04/1967 | |
62002 | 26606 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/06/1949 | 31/10/1966 | |
62003 | 26607 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 03/06/1949 | 07/06/1965 | |
62004 | 26608 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 10/06/1949 | 16/12/1966 | |
62005 | 26609 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 10/06/1949 | 30/12/1967 | |
62006 | 26610 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 15/06/1949 | 04/09/1966 | |
62007 | 26611 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 17/06/1949 | 09/09/1967 | |
62008 | 26612 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 21/06/1949 | 31/12/1966 | |
62009 | 26613 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 23/06/1949 | 23/11/1964 | |
62010 | 26614 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 27/06/1949 | 18/10/1965 | |
62011 | 26615 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 29/06/1949 | 09/09/1967 | |
62012 | 26616 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/07/1949 | 17/05/1967 | |
62013 | 26617 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 04/07/1949 | 29/10/1963 | |
62014 | 26618 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 05/07/1949 | 06/06/1965 | |
62015 | 26619 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 07/07/1949 | 25/07/1965 | |
62016 | 26620 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 08/07/1949 | 13/07/1963 | |
62017 | 26621 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 12/07/1949 | 20/02/1967 | |
62018 | 26622 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 13/07/1949 | 13/03/1964 | |
62019 | 26623 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 15/07/1949 | 02/07/1964 | |
62020 | 26624 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/08/1949 | 10/01/1965 | |
62021 | 26625 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 02/08/1949 | 30/10/1966 | |
62022 | 26626 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 04/08/1949 | 04/09/1966 | |
62023 | 26627 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 05/08/1949 | 26/06/1967 | |
62024 | 26628 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 08/08/1949 | 13/02/1967 | |
62025 | 26629 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 10/08/1949 | 10/04/1967 | |
62026 | 26630 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 11/08/1949 | 01/07/1967 | |
62027 | 26631 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 15/08/1949 | 20/03/1967 | |
62028 | 26632 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 17/08/1949 | 21/11/1966 | |
62029 | 26633 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 19/08/1949 | 05/10/1964 | |
62030 | 26634 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 22/08/1949 | 09/08/1965 | |
62031 | 26635 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 24/08/1949 | 29/12/1962 | |
62032 | 26636 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 26/08/1949 | 07/09/1963 | |
62033 | 26637 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 31/08/1949 | 10/01/1965 | |
62034 | 26638 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/09/1949 | 29/12/1962 | |
62035 | 26639 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 07/09/1949 | 18/07/1965 | |
62036 | 26640 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 09/09/1949 | 26/10/1963 | |
62037 | 26641 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 14/09/1949 | 26/12/1964 | |
62038 | 26642 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 16/09/1949 | 16/10/1963 | |
62039 | 26643 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 22/09/1949 | 14/12/1963 | |
62040 | 26644 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 03/10/1949 | 10/01/1965 | |
62041 | 26645 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 05/10/1949 | 10/04/1967 | |
62042 | 26646 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 07/10/1949 | 01/07/1967 | |
62043 | 26647 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 10/10/1949 | 12/07/1965 | |
62044 | 26648 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 13/10/1949 | 01/07/1967 | |
62045 | 26649 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 14/10/1949 | 09/09/1967 | |
62046 | 26650 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 21/10/1949 | 12/02/1967 | |
62047 | 26651 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 20/10/1949 | 01/03/1965 | |
62048 | 26652 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 21/10/1949 | 19/06/1967 | |
62049 | 26653 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 25/10/1949 | 14/06/1965 | |
62050 | 26654 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 28/10/1949 | 09/09/1967 | |
62051 | 26655 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 03/11/1949 | 10/01/1965 | |
62052 | 26656 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 04/11/1949 | 29/12/1962 | |
62053 | 26657 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 08/11/1949 | 24/12/1963 | |
62054 | 26658 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 11/11/1949 | 20/12/1964 | |
62055 | 26659 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 17/11/1949 | 26/12/1964 | |
62056 | 26660 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 24/11/1949 | 18/05/1965 | |
62057 | 26661 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 30/11/1949 | 01/05/1967 | |
62058 | 26662 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 06/12/1949 | 03/08/1964 | |
62059 | 26663 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 13/12/1949 | 12/02/1967 | |
62060 | 26664 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 20/12/1949 | 02/08/1967 | |
62061 | 26665 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 12/1949 | 14/12/1964 | |
62062 | 26666 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/1950 | 24/05/1967 | |
62063 | 26667 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/1950 | 07/09/1964 | |
62064 | 26668 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/1950 | 13/09/1965 | |
62065 | 26669 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/1950 | 20/03/1967 | |
62066 | 26670 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 27/01/1950 | 10/01/1965 | |
62067 | 26671 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 01/02/1950 | 18/01/1967 | |
62068 | 26672 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 14/02/1950 | 18/01/1964 | |
62069 | 26673 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 20/02/1950 | 21/01/1964 | |
62070 | 26674 | K1 | LNER | Peppercorn | 2-6-0 | 29/03/1950 | 10/01/1965 |