Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 09/1948 |
For | 40 Steam locomotives |
Class | B1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
61360 | 26819 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/03/1950 | 17/04/1966 | |
61361 | 26820 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/03/1950 | 26/12/1965 | |
61362 | 26821 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1950 | 16/09/1962 | |
61363 | 26822 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 05/04/1950 | 23/09/1962 | |
61364 | 26823 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 19/04/1950 | 16/09/1962 | |
61365 | 26824 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 21/04/1950 | 11/07/1965 | |
61366 | 26825 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/04/1950 | 17/12/1962 | |
61367 | 26826 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/04/1950 | 22/08/1965 | |
61368 | 26827 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1950 | 29/01/1962 | |
61369 | 26828 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/05/1950 | 21/12/1963 | |
61370 | 26829 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 10/10/1950 | 04/07/1965 | |
61371 | 26830 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/10/1950 | 16/09/1962 | |
61382 | 26831 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/09/1951 | 07/12/1964 | |
61383 | 26832 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 03/10/1951 | 21/01/1963 | |
61374 | 26833 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/02/1951 | 22/09/1963 | |
61375 | 26834 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/02/1951 | 25/11/1963 | |
61376 | 26835 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/04/1951 | 05/02/1962 | |
61377 | 26836 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 01/05/1951 | 16/09/1962 | |
61378 | 26837 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 25/05/1951 | 25/11/1963 | |
61379 | 26838 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/06/1951 | 06/08/1962 | |
61380 | 26839 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/08/1951 | 26/03/1962 | |
61381 | 26840 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/09/1951 | 01/11/1962 | |
61372 | 26841 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 08/12/1950 | 20/06/1965 | |
61373 | 26842 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/12/1950 | 16/09/1962 | |
61384 | 26843 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 17/10/1951 | 09/01/1966 | |
61385 | 26844 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 25/10/1951 | 31/10/1965 | |
61386 | 26845 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/10/1951 | 31/12/1966 | |
61387 | 26846 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/11/1951 | 31/10/1965 | |
61388 | 26847 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/11/1951 | 24/06/1967 | |
61389 | 26848 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/11/1951 | 14/11/1965 | |
61390 | 26849 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/12/1951 | 19/02/1966 | |
61391 | 26850 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/12/1951 | 10/09/1962 | |
61392 | 26851 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 27/12/1951 | 20/06/1965 | |
61393 | 26852 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/01/1952 | 22/09/1963 | |
61394 | 26853 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/01/1952 | 14/11/1965 | |
61395 | 26854 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 01/02/1952 | 01/10/1962 | |
61396 | 26855 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 20/02/1952 | 10/09/1965 | |
61397 | 26856 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 13/03/1952 | 26/06/1965 | |
61398 | 26857 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/03/1952 | 05/11/1964 | |
61399 | 26858 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/04/1952 | 22/09/1963 |