Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3901 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17307 Week
» 70323 Month
» 189850 Year
» 3216703 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Order Book
Lot Number |
Order Number |
Order Date |
For |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number Off |
Info |
|
A12 |
30/06/1886 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Jubilee |
0-4-2 |
10 |
1st Nine Elms series |
|
A7 |
13/06/1894 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
T1 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
B10 |
1900 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
B12 |
1904 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
B13 |
1905 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
B3 |
27/02/1889 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
O2 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
C10 |
1900 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
C12 |
1904 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
D13 |
1906 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
D4 |
06/08/1890 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
O2 |
0-4-4T |
20 |
|
|
E1 |
30/06/1886 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Jubilee |
0-4-2 |
10 |
1st Nine Elms series |
|
E9 |
1899 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
F6 |
29/03/1893 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
T1 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
G11 |
1903 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
H11 |
1903 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
K3 |
29/01/1890 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
O2 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
K6 |
22/11/1893 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Jubilee |
0-4-2 |
10 |
2nd Nine Elms series |
|
M2 |
30/06/1888 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Jubilee |
0-4-2 |
10 |
2nd Nine Elms series |
|
M7 |
1897 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
25 |
|
|
Unknown |
05/1889 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
X2 |
4-4-0 |
20 |
Costs varied throughout this order as some locos were built wth narrow cabs and some with wide, plus variations in tenders. Cheapest were 7 engines at £2,490, then 3 at £2,570 and the remaining 10 at £2,680. |
|
Unknown |
04/12/1889 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
T3 |
4-4-0 |
20 |
Order places on 4th December 1889 for 10 locos, augmented on 11th June 1890 by a further 10. Current commitments meant construction didn't commence until December 1892. |
|
Unknown |
03/10/1894 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
T6 |
4-4-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
28/11/1894 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
X6 |
4-4-0 |
10 |
|
|
O2 |
30/01/1889 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
O2 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
O4 |
11/03/1891 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Jubilee |
0-4-2 |
10 |
2nd Nine Elms series |
|
R6 |
13/06/1893 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
O2 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
S6 |
21/02/1894 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
T1 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
T1 |
23/11/1887 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
T1 |
0-4-4T |
20 |
Increased from 10 to 20 locos on 29th February 1888. |
|
V7 |
1898 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
X12 |
1905 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|
|
Y12 |
1905 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
M7 |
0-4-4T |
5 |
|