Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 06/08/1890 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | O2 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
207 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 12/1891 | 29/06/1957 | ||
208 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 12/1891 | 12/1966 | ||
209 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 12/1891 | 03/1967 | ||
210 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 12/1891 | 05/1966 | ||
211 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 03/1892 | 12/1966 | ||
212 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 05/1892 | 05/12/1959 | ||
213 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 05/1892 | 14/02/1953 | ||
214 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1892 | 07/1940 | ||
215 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1892 | 12/1966 | ||
216 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1892 | 11/1957 | ||
217 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1892 | 12/1966 | ||
218 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 08/1892 | 12/1966 | ||
219 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 09/1892 | 09/1965 | ||
220 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 09/1892 | 12/1965 | ||
221 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 09/1892 | 15/08/1953 | ||
222 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 09/1892 | 02/1933 | ||
223 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 10/1892 | 10/1961 | ||
224 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 10/1892 | 08/02/1958 | ||
225 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 11/1892 | 23/12/1962 | ||
226 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 11/1892 | 10/1964 |