Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 29/01/1890 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | O2 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
197 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1891 | 07/02/1953 | ||
198 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1891 | 06/1964 | ||
199 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1891 | 23/12/1962 | ||
200 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1891 | 04/08/1962 | ||
201 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 07/1891 | 08/1955 | ||
202 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 07/1891 | 05/1966 | ||
203 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 08/1891 | 17/12/1955 | ||
204 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 08/1891 | 24/01/1953 | ||
205 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 09/1891 | 05/1966 | ||
206 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 09/1891 | 11/1955 |