Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 30/01/1889 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | O2 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
177 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 12/1889 | 03/10/1959 | ||
178 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 12/1889 | 12/1966 | ||
179 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 03/1890 | 19/12/1959 | ||
180 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 04/1890 | 03/1967 | ||
181 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 05/1890 | 10/1966 | ||
182 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 05/1890 | 09/01/1960 | ||
183 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 05/1890 | 16/09/1961 | ||
184 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1890 | 12/1966 | ||
185 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 06/1890 | 05/1940 | ||
186 | O2 | LSWR | Adams | 0-4-4T | 07/1890 | 12/1966 |