Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 232 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4869 Week
» 16162 Month
» 280795 Year
» 1502360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.



Order Details for Lot No: NS/E884
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Date 01/1902
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class B5

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1067 6235 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1902 20/11/1947  
1068 6236 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1902 23/12/1947  
1069 6237 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1902 13/11/1948  
1070 6238 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1902 06/03/1939  
1071 6239 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1902 23/06/1948  
1072 6240 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1902 14/08/1947