Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.



Order Details for Lot No: NS/NS973
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Date 1901
For 40 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
973 6035 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 30/06/1959  
974 6036 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 29/11/1958  
975 6037 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 11/04/1955  
976 6038 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 24/04/1959  
977 6039 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 25/07/1962  
978 6040 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 04/08/1958  
979 6041 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 10/10/1955  
980 6042 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 08/05/1959  
981 6043 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 05/11/1960  
982 6044 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1901 27/06/1955  
983 6045 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1901 26/05/1958  
984 6046 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1901 07/11/1955  
985 6047 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 20/07/1962  
986 6048 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 23/12/1957  
987 6049 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 05/09/1959  
988 6050 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 30/09/1957  
989 6051 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 07/07/1958  
990 6052 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 20/06/1959  
991 6053 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 26/12/1959  
992 6054 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 10/11/1955  
993 6055 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 16/09/1957  
994 6056 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1901 02/05/1955  
995 6057 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 01/1902 30/09/1958  
996 6058 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 01/1902 25/02/1957  
997 6059 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1902 11/04/1959  
  6060 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1902 20/07/1962  
999 6061 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 23/08/1958  
1000 6062 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 04/07/1955  
1001 6063 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 08/09/1961  
1002 6064 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 27/08/1956  
1003 6065 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 04/03/1961  
1004 6066 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 14/01/1961  
1005 6067 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 02/02/1957  
1006 6068 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 18/05/1961  
1007 6069 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 23/09/1962  
1008 6070 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1902 19/04/1960  
1009 6071 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1902 29/08/1961  
1010 6072 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1902 15/03/1961  
1011 6073 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1902 15/08/1962  
1012 6074 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1902 17/08/1959