Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.



Order Details for Lot No: NS/NS974
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Date 1902
For 9 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1043 6226 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1902 19/10/1957  
1044 6227 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1902 20/07/1959  
1045 6228 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1902 07/10/1957  
1046 6229 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1902 27/10/1955  
1047 6230 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1902 23/09/1962  
1048 6231 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1902 08/11/1960  
1049 6232 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1902 08/08/1955  
1050 6233 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1902 02/02/1957  
1051 6234 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1902 20/03/1959