Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Nasmyth Wilson



Order Details for Lot No: NW/L926
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Date 1917
For 24 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1701 1244 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 10/02/1959  
1702 1245 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917  
1703 1246 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917  
1704 1247 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917  
1705 1248 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1706 1249 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1707 1250 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1708 1251 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1709 1252 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918  
1710 1253 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918  
1711 1254 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918  
1712 1255 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 11/07/1965  
1713 1256 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 15/09/1962  
1714 1257 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918  
1715 1258 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918  
1716 1259 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 13/09/1941  
1717 1260 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 08/08/1962  
1718 1261 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 19/09/1941  
1719 1262 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 19/09/1941  
1720 1263 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918  
1721 1264 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 20/12/1964  
1722 1265 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 09/12/1962  
1723 1266 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 12/03/1959  
1724 1267 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 19/12/1965