Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Builder | Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Date | 1918 |
For | 16 Steam locomotives |
Class | O4 |
Information | Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1671 | 3715 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 03/1918 | 17/11/1962 | |
1672 | 3716 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 03/1918 | 20/09/1941 | |
1673 | 3717 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 04/1918 | 20/06/1965 | |
1674 | 3718 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 04/1918 | 14/09/1941 | |
1675 | 3719 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 04/1918 | 30/10/1959 | |
1676 | 3720 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 05/10/1941 | |
1677 | 3721 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 09/12/1962 | |
1678 | 3722 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 24/04/1959 | |
1679 | 3723 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 06/1918 | 29/08/1965 | |
1680 | 3724 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 06/1918 | 19/09/1941 | |
1682 | 3726 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 06/1918 | 08/06/1959 | |
1683 | 3727 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1918 | 13/09/1941 | |
1684 | 3728 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1918 | 01/08/1965 | |
1685 | 3729 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1918 | 19/09/1964 | |
1686 | 3730 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1918 | 31/01/1965 |