Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2319 Week
» 21964 Month
» 56606 Year
» 1278171 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd



Order Details for Lot No: RS/E105
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Date 1918
For 16 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1671 3715 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 17/11/1962  
1672 3716 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 20/09/1941  
1673 3717 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 20/06/1965  
1674 3718 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 14/09/1941  
1675 3719 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 30/10/1959  
1676 3720 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 05/10/1941  
1677 3721 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 09/12/1962  
1678 3722 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 24/04/1959  
1679 3723 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 29/08/1965  
1680 3724 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 19/09/1941  
1681 3725 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918  
1682 3726 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 08/06/1959  
1683 3727 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 13/09/1941  
1684 3728 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 01/08/1965  
1685 3729 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 19/09/1964  
1686 3730 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 31/01/1965