Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd



Order Details for Lot No: RS/E106
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Date 1918
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1647 3731 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 17/03/1963  
1648 3732 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918  
1649 3733 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 14/04/1963  
1650 3734 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 26/09/1965  
1687 3735 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 13/09/1941  
1688 3736 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 23/09/1962