Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd



Order Details for Lot No: RS/E107
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Date 1918
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1689 3737 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1918 23/02/1961  
1690 3738 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1918 19/09/1941  
1691 3739 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919 18/10/1941  
1692 3740 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919 26/11/1962  
1693 3741 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919 10/08/1962  
1694 3742 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919 20/03/1959  
1695 3743 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 28/01/1964  
1696 3744 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 06/07/1960  
1697 3745 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1919 04/04/1965  
1698 3746 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1919  
1699 3747 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1919 29/12/1962  
1700 3748 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919 19/09/1941