Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 775 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 775 Week
» 18111 Month
» 295907 Year
» 1180288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd



Order Details for Lot No: RS/E109
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Date 1919
For 22 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1635 3755 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919  
1636 3756 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 11/10/1941  
1638 3757 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 19/09/1941  
1640 3758 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 08/08/1962  
1641 3759 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 11/07/1965  
1733 3760 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919  
1734 3761 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919  
1735 3762 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919  
1736 3763 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919  
1737 3764 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919 23/04/1964  
1738 3765 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919 18/10/1941  
1739 3766 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919 20/12/1964  
1740 3767 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919  
1741 3768 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919 31/03/1959  
1742 3769 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919  
1743 3770 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919 02/01/1966  
1744 3771 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1919  
1745 3772 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1919  
1746 3773 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1919 29/10/1963  
1747 3774 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1919 05/09/1965  
1748 3775 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1920 14/01/1960  
1749 3776 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1920 08/08/1965