Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Builder | Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Date | 02/1934 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | K3 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1325 | 4075 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1934 | 04/07/1962 | |
1332 | 4076 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1934 | 17/12/1962 | |
1333 | 4077 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1934 | 24/07/1959 | |
1339 | 4078 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1934 | 12/02/1962 | |
1399 | 4079 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1934 | 04/11/1962 | |
1322 | 4080 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 01/1935 | 23/07/1962 | |
1307 | 4081 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 01/1935 | 26/11/1962 | |
2938 | 4082 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 01/1935 | 25/11/1961 | |
2939 | 4083 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 01/1935 | 12/03/1960 | |
2940 | 4084 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 01/1935 | 29/12/1961 |