Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Builder | Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Date | 1875 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | G6 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1340 | 1644 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 05/1875 | 04/06/1956 | |
1341 | 1645 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 05/1875 | 04/1950 | |
1342 | 1646 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 05/1875 | 27/01/1958 | |
1343 | 1647 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 05/1875 | 04/1934 | |
1344 | 1648 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 06/1875 | 19/01/1953 | |
1345 | 1649 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 06/1875 | 31/12/1921 | |
1346 | 1650 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 06/1875 | 07/04/1958 | |
1347 | 1651 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 06/1875 | 10/1948 | |
1348 | 1652 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 06/1875 | 12/07/1954 | |
1349 | 1653 | G6 | NER | Fletcher | 0-4-4T | 06/1875 | 12/05/1958 |