Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Builder | Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Date | 1951 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | 94xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
9410 | 7547 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 03/02/1950 | 13/07/1962 | |
9411 | 7548 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 28/02/1950 | 03/06/1965 | |
9412 | 7549 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 13/03/1950 | 08/03/1963 | |
9413 | 7550 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/03/1950 | 22/11/1963 | |
9414 | 7551 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 11/04/1950 | 29/08/1960 | |
9415 | 7552 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1950 | 03/06/1965 | |
9416 | 7553 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 04/05/1950 | 08/01/1962 | |
9417 | 7554 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 10/05/1950 | 08/06/1959 | |
9418 | 7555 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1950 | 03/06/1965 | |
9419 | 7556 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 05/06/1950 | 14/03/1963 | |
9420 | 7557 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 26/06/1950 | 10/03/1964 | |
9421 | 7558 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 07/07/1950 | 12/02/1962 | |
9422 | 7559 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 20/07/1950 | 28/12/1963 | |
9423 | 7560 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/07/1950 | 01/03/1963 | |
9424 | 7561 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 03/08/1950 | 29/11/1962 | |
9425 | 7562 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 01/09/1950 | 28/11/1963 | |
9426 | 7563 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/09/1950 | 07/05/1965 | |
9427 | 7564 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 18/09/1950 | 15/06/1959 | |
9428 | 7565 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 29/09/1950 | 30/06/1960 | |
9429 | 7566 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 12/10/1950 | 28/12/1963 | |
9430 | 7567 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/10/1950 | 16/06/1965 | |
9431 | 7568 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 08/11/1950 | 20/04/1964 | |
9432 | 7569 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/11/1950 | 23/11/1959 | |
9433 | 7570 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 08/12/1950 | 13/07/1962 | |
9434 | 7571 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 12/01/1951 | 30/06/1960 | |
9435 | 7572 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/01/1951 | 28/09/1964 | |
9436 | 7573 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 18/01/1951 | 18/07/1960 | |
9437 | 7574 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/01/1951 | 03/06/1965 | |
9438 | 7575 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 07/02/1951 | 15/06/1959 | |
9439 | 7576 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 13/02/1951 | 15/06/1959 | |
9440 | 7577 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 22/02/1951 | 23/07/1963 | |
9441 | 7578 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 09/03/1951 | 20/11/1963 | |
9442 | 7579 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 22/03/1951 | 06/07/1964 | |
9443 | 7580 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 29/03/1951 | 15/06/1959 | |
9444 | 7581 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 12/04/1951 | 22/03/1963 | |
9445 | 7582 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/04/1951 | 11/01/1960 | |
9446 | 7583 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1951 | 07/05/1965 | |
9447 | 7584 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 21/05/1951 | 12/01/1961 | |
9448 | 7585 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/05/1951 | 13/07/1962 | |
9449 | 7586 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 12/06/1951 | 30/06/1960 | |
9450 | 7587 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 28/06/1951 | 25/06/1964 | |
9451 | 7588 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 25/07/1951 | 13/07/1962 | |
9452 | 7589 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/07/1951 | 07/05/1965 | |
9453 | 7590 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/07/1951 | 06/11/1964 | |
9454 | 7591 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 05/09/1951 | 08/01/1962 | |
9455 | 7592 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 06/09/1951 | 11/04/1963 | |
9456 | 7593 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 21/09/1951 | 08/04/1964 | |
9457 | 7594 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 04/10/1951 | 06/07/1964 | |
9458 | 7595 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 22/10/1951 | 12/01/1961 | |
9459 | 7596 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 01/11/1951 | 28/09/1959 |