Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 01/1913 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | B12 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1505 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 02/1913 | 25/03/1952 | ||
1507 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 03/1913 | 26/02/1953 | ||
1508 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 03/1913 | 30/04/1953 | ||
1509 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 04/1913 | 15/10/1948 | ||
1510 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 04/1913 | 06/1949 | ||
1511 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 05/1913 | 05/05/1952 | ||
1512 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 06/1913 | 01/01/1957 | ||
1513 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 06/1913 | 18/02/1953 | ||
1514 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 06/1913 | 07/10/1959 |