Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 102 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 102 Week
» 21004 Month
» 21004 Year
» 1242569 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/B54
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 07/1902
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J16

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1190   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1902 13/04/1959  
1191   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1902 16/09/1962  
1192   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1902 04/05/1959  
1193   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1902 02/05/1955  
1194   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1902 23/11/1959  
1195   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1902 26/10/1959  
1196   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1902 04/01/1960  
1197   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1902 06/09/1954  
1198   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1902 07/03/1960  
1199   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1902 19/12/1960