Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 110 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7564 Week
» 10146 Month
» 274779 Year
» 1496344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/D56
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 10/1903
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1850   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1903 17/10/1955  
1851   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1903 15/10/1956  
1852   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1903 13/10/1958  
1853   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1903 24/11/1959  
1854   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 01/1904 22/09/1958  
1855   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 02/1904 18/06/1957  
1856   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1904 02/1951  
1857   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1904 08/10/1957  
1858   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1904 12/12/1955  
1859   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1904 11/1946