Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 313 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4950 Week
» 16243 Month
» 280876 Year
» 1502441 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/F48
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 07/1900
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J16

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1150   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1900 03/03/1958  
1151   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1900 29/01/1958  
1152   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1900 01/09/1959  
1153   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1900 22/08/1960  
1154   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1900 27/10/1958  
1155   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1900 06/11/1959  
1156   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1900 22/08/1960  
1157   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1900 10/09/1961  
1158   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1900 03/06/1958  
1159   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1900 27/01/1958