Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 144 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7885 Week
» 28327 Month
» 365173 Year
» 1586738 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/G75
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 10/1913
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J68
Information Shunters

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
21   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 12/1913 04/12/1960  
22   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 12/1913 24/08/1959  
23   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 12/1913 10/09/1961  
24   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 12/1913 11/10/1960  
25   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 12/1913 19/05/1958  
26   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 12/1913 28/09/1959  
27   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 12/1913 28/07/1958  
28   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 01/1914 11/03/1960  
29   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 01/1914 24/11/1959  
30   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 02/1914 04/04/1960